Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/17/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/27/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/09/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/18/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/23/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/24/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/29/2013