Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/12/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/25/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/09/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/09/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/11/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/06/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 12/11/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 02/04/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/24/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/24/2014