Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/03/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/20/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/26/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/14/2013