Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/23/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/18/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/18/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/26/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/10/2013