Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/05/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/06/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/06/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/07/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/07/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/07/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/07/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/07/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/07/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/07/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/07/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/02/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2013