Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/09/2013