Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/13/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/13/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/13/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/14/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/10/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 04/10/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/10/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/21/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/03/2013