Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/18/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/26/2013