Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/28/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/14/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/15/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/20/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/20/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/20/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/10/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/10/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/10/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/10/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/10/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/24/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/24/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/24/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/24/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/24/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/24/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/24/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/03/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/15/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/15/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/15/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/04/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/04/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/05/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/12/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/12/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/08/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/08/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/08/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/11/2013