Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/26/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/06/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/24/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/14/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 06/20/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/22/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/15/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/19/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/08/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/14/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/21/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/10/2014