Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/25/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/25/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/26/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/28/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/28/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/28/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/04/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/05/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/12/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/12/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/12/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/19/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/11/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/23/2013