Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 12/12/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 12/12/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 01/09/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/09/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/09/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/09/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/09/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/09/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/17/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 01/17/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 01/17/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/17/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/17/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/17/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/17/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/17/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/17/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 01/17/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/17/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/17/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/17/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/17/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/17/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 01/28/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/28/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 01/28/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 01/28/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/04/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/04/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/04/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/04/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/04/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/04/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/04/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 02/10/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/10/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/10/2014
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 02/10/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/11/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 02/14/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/14/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/25/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/06/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/06/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/06/2014