Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 11/20/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 11/20/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 11/20/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/21/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/02/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 12/02/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/05/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 12/05/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 12/05/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 12/05/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 12/05/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 12/05/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/11/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/11/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 12/12/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/17/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 02/06/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/11/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/18/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/11/2014