Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 11/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/19/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/22/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/22/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/22/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/02/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 12/10/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 12/10/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/19/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/21/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/28/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/04/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/08/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/09/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/09/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew