Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/15/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/18/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 11/18/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/07/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/14/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/03/2014