Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 11/12/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 11/13/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/13/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/13/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/15/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/18/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 11/18/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 11/18/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 11/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/18/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 11/18/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/19/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013