Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/30/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/12/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/12/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/15/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 11/15/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/18/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/18/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 11/19/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/19/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/19/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/03/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/04/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/14/2014