Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/22/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/22/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/03/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/10/2014