Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 09/27/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/01/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/01/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/01/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/01/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/01/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/01/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/01/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 10/01/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/01/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/01/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 10/02/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/02/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/02/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 10/02/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 10/02/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/02/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 10/02/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/04/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/04/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/04/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/04/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/04/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/09/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/09/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/09/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/09/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/10/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 10/10/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/10/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/10/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/16/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/16/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/16/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 10/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/16/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 10/22/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/30/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 10/30/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/13/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/13/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 11/13/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/15/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/21/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 12/04/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/04/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 12/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/14/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 02/05/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 02/26/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/11/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/26/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/26/2014