Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/05/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 02/05/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/11/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 03/13/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/14/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/09/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/23/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/10/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew