Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/11/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/13/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 06/26/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/23/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew