Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/26/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/10/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 02/10/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew