Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/12/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew