Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/30/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/31/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/31/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/31/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/31/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/01/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 08/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/11/2013