Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/11/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/23/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 09/25/2013