Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 07/09/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/10/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/10/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/10/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/10/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/10/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/10/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/10/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/10/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/10/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/10/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/10/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/10/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/10/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/16/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 07/23/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/23/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/24/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/25/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/25/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/31/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/31/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/31/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 07/31/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/31/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/31/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/31/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 08/01/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 08/01/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 08/02/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/09/2013