Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/10/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/23/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/31/2013