Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/09/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/09/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/09/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/19/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/23/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/19/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/20/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/02/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 12/02/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/03/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/04/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/09/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/07/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/04/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/10/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/27/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/27/2014