Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/15/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/15/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/19/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/19/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/19/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/22/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/30/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 08/01/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 08/01/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 08/01/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 08/02/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/11/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/11/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/11/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/11/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/11/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/11/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/11/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/19/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/19/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/19/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/26/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/26/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/26/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/26/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 09/26/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/30/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/10/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/10/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/09/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/10/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/10/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew