Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/06/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 06/06/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/13/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/30/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 11/14/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/15/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/19/2013