Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/06/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/25/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 08/01/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/26/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/15/2013