Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/05/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 06/05/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/05/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/05/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/14/2013