Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/22/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 05/22/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/12/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 07/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/31/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/12/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/12/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/20/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/20/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/26/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/26/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 09/26/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/26/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/26/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/08/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/08/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/30/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 10/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/30/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/30/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/19/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/21/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 11/21/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/04/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 12/16/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/16/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/16/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/16/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/16/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/16/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/14/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/14/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/04/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/04/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/05/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/06/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/11/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/03/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/03/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/03/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 04/03/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/03/2014