Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/17/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/17/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/17/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/20/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/20/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/20/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/20/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/20/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/24/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/03/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/12/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/12/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/13/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/13/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/17/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/19/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/08/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/09/2013