Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/13/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/13/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/13/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/13/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 05/13/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 05/13/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/18/2013