Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/20/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/17/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/26/2013