Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/08/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/14/2013