Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 05/07/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/13/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/13/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/13/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/13/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/13/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/13/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/13/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/13/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/13/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/13/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/13/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/13/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/13/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/13/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 05/13/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/13/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/13/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/13/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/13/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/13/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/13/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/13/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/13/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/13/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/13/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 05/13/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/13/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/13/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/13/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/13/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/13/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/04/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/04/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/04/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/04/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/04/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/05/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/22/2013