Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/07/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/07/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/07/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/07/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/07/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/07/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/07/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/07/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/07/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/07/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/07/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 05/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/09/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/09/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/09/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/09/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/09/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/13/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/13/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/21/2013