Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/06/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/06/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/06/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/06/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/07/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/07/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 05/07/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/09/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/09/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/14/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/16/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/21/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/21/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/21/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/03/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/18/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/25/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/25/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/14/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/02/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/07/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/09/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 04/09/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/10/2014