Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 01/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 01/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/23/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/23/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 01/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/23/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 01/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/23/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 01/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 01/23/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/13/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 02/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/15/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/26/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/26/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/26/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/10/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 08/01/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/04/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/11/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/26/2014