Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/25/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/25/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/25/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/03/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/03/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/14/2013