Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 04/23/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 04/23/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 04/23/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 04/23/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/24/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/24/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 04/24/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/24/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/24/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/24/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/24/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/24/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/24/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/24/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/24/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/24/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/24/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/24/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/24/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/24/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/24/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/24/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/24/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/24/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/24/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/24/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/24/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/25/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/25/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/25/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/25/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/25/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/25/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/25/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/26/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/26/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/26/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/26/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/26/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/26/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/26/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/26/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 04/26/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/06/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/06/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/06/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 05/06/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/06/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/06/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/06/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/08/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/21/2013