Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/12/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/31/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 09/27/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/02/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 10/02/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 10/02/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/02/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/02/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/02/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/02/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 10/02/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 10/07/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/07/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/07/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 10/07/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/07/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/08/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 12/03/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/09/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/03/2014