Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/10/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/23/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/23/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/23/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/06/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/26/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/10/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 01/09/2014