Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/15/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/15/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/17/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/18/2013