Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/18/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/20/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/20/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/20/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/21/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/23/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/25/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/03/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/03/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/03/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/03/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/09/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/14/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/14/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/20/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/20/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/20/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/24/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/24/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/24/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/24/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/04/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/04/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/13/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/13/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/13/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 06/17/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/17/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/17/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/30/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/31/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/10/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/10/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/10/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 12/04/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/05/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/27/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/25/2014