Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/26/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/26/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 09/30/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 10/08/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/09/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 10/09/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/09/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/16/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/16/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/16/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/16/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/16/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/30/2013