Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/12/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/16/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 09/16/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 09/16/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/16/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/16/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/16/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/16/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 09/16/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/16/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/16/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/16/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/16/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/16/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/16/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 09/16/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/16/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/16/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/17/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 09/17/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/17/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/17/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/17/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/18/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/19/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew