Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 08/01/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 08/01/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/04/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/11/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/11/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 10/11/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/11/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/11/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/11/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/11/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/11/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/11/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 10/11/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/11/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/11/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/11/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/11/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/11/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 10/11/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/11/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 10/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/11/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/11/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/11/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/11/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/11/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/11/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 10/11/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/11/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 10/11/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/11/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/11/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 10/11/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/11/2013
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/15/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/15/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 10/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/23/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/30/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/30/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/30/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/08/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 01/10/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/10/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/10/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/10/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 01/10/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/10/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 01/29/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/29/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 01/29/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/29/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/29/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/11/2014